THE EDRIDGE FUND OF NAPO THE TRADE UNION AND PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR FAMILY COURT AND PROBATION STAFF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of financial hardship and distress for a wide range of staff within the Probation Service and CAFCASS (Family Court Service), by making of grants and support from local representatives of the Fund. The Fund also conducts fund raising to continue the work of the Fund.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 06 June 1990: Standard registration
- EDRIDGE FUND (Working name)
- THE EDRIDGE FUND (Working name)
- EDRIDGE FUND OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF PROBATION OFFICERS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin David Ling | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Goode | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Francis Sanders | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN HANKINSON | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Mack | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Stuart Stevens | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.32k | £32.89k | £25.30k | £62.28k | £35.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.26k | £30.25k | £26.62k | £36.99k | £45.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 September 2024 | 308 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 September 2024 | 308 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 September 2024 | 671 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 September 2024 | 671 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 MAY 1990 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11 JUL 2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27 SEP 2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 09 MAY 2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 06 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
THE FUND SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST AND SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT OF ASSISTING THE FOLLOWING PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS: A) PERSONS WHOSE WORK IS, OR HAS BEEN WHOLLY OR MAINLY IN PROBATION AND FAMILY COURTS, AND; B) WHO ARE ELIGIBLE TO BE FULL MEMBERS, PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATE MEMBERS (PAMS) OR RETIRED MEMBERS OF NAPO UNDER ITS RULES: OR D) DEPENDENTS OF ANY OF THE ABOVE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
65 Mortlake High Street
Boat Race House
LONDON
SW14 8HL
- Phone:
- 020 3397 7025
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window