Governing document THE EDRIDGE FUND OF NAPO THE TRADE UNION AND PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR FAMILY COURT AND PROBATION STAFF

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 MAY 1990 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11 JUL 2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27 SEP 2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 09 MAY 2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 06 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
THE FUND SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST AND SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT OF ASSISTING THE FOLLOWING PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS: A) PERSONS WHOSE WORK IS, OR HAS BEEN WHOLLY OR MAINLY IN PROBATION AND FAMILY COURTS, AND; B) WHO ARE ELIGIBLE TO BE FULL MEMBERS, PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATE MEMBERS (PAMS) OR RETIRED MEMBERS OF NAPO UNDER ITS RULES: OR D) DEPENDENTS OF ANY OF THE ABOVE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.