THE BRITAIN-AUSTRALIA SOCIETY EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping young people from Britain and Australia to develop through the power of learning and the opportunity to travel. Pioneer Awards unlock the potential of school students through an educational experience on the other side of the world. Endeavour Awards enable talented young adults to acquire and transfer skills building on the shared heritage and cultural links between Britain and Australia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Australia
Governance
- 16 July 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Michael May | Chair | 08 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Alison Louise Payne | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Jefferis Woodburn Benson KC | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Leisha White | Trustee | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Graeme Newton ACA | Trustee | 30 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Gregory James Mulley | Trustee | 30 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Martin | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Emeritus Carl Bridge | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE MAVYN LYLE-SMITH | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.94k | £25.28k | £18.20k | £71.22k | £48.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.06k | £12.80k | £28.95k | £42.08k | £89.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21/05/1990 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/06/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ABOUT AUSTRALIA IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR IN AUSTRALIAN HISTORY, GEOGRAPHY, ARTS AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BRITAIN AUSTRALIA SOCIETY
Australia Centre
Strand
LONDON
WC2B 4LG
- Phone:
- 02076301075
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window