Trustees SHENLEY PARK TRUST

Charity number: 803520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTHONY HARRIS Chair 28 May 2012
None on record
Morris Bright Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Harvey Patterson Trustee 20 June 2023
None on record
richard butler Trustee 11 June 2023
None on record
Jonathan Shaw Trustee 07 June 2023
None on record
WILLIAM SUSMAN Trustee 07 June 2023
None on record
steve harrington-smith Trustee 23 May 2017
None on record
WARREN GORDON Trustee 28 May 2012
None on record
ROSEMARY GILLIGAN Trustee
None on record
NEIL HIBBERT Trustee
None on record