YMCA West Kent

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping Young People Build Their Future by: Housing Training Outreach Enterprise Support Counselling Skills for life for work & for living Christian charity committed to helping: -Young People in need regardless of gender, sexuality, race, ability, faith -Vulnerable adults [learning/physical disability, MH issues] www.WestKentYMCA.org.uk/film Passion 4 diversity empowering staff & clients
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 30 June 1990: Standard registration
- RYDER HOUSE - SUPPORTED HOUSING FOR HOMELESS MEN & WOMEN AGED 16-30 (Working name)
- THE HORIZON PROJECT - SUPPORTED VOCATIONAL TRAINING WWW.HORIZONPROJECT.CO.UK (Working name)
- V4C - Vehicle for Change (Working name)
- WEST KENT YMCA (Working name)
- YMCA Furniture Stores - SOCIAL ENTERPRISE, WORK BASED LEARNING, RE-USE AND RECYCLING - OF BIKES AND UPCYCLING, HELPING PEOPLE GET ON THE PROPERTY LADDER (Working name)
- YMCA West Kent (Working name)
- YMCA West Kent Limited (Working name)
- WEST KENT YMCA (Previous name)
- WEST KENT YMCA FURNITURE WAREHOUSE - SOCIAL ENTERPRISE, WORK BASED LEARNING, RE-USE AND RECYCLING, HELPING PEOPLE GET ON THE PROPERTY LADDER (Previous name)
- Homes England
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Stevenson | Trustee | 12 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Jones | Trustee | 08 May 2025 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.35m | £1.28m | £2.99m | £1.42m | £287.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.41m | £1.30m | £1.18m | £1.55m | £597.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £240.00k | £250.00k | £358.01k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £187.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £122.16k | £326.57k | £184.61k | £309.13k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £225.84k | £76.61k | £6.60k | £2.03k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £999.39k | £875.85k | £902.85k | £1.08m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £12.16k | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £69 | £18.94k | £21.95k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £1.50k | £0 | £1.87m | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £110.00k | £0 | £0 | £65.62k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.19m | £1.09m | £1.18m | £1.55m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £214.41k | £204.24k | £283 | £105 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £16.02k | £17.20k | £30.62k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £20 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 April 2025 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
17 April 2025 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
10 June 2024 | 131 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH JUNE 1990; AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20TH JANUARY 2004 AND 29 NOVEMBER 2005. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31 JAN 2018 as amended on 18 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
I) TO FURTHER THE CAUSE AND WORK OF YOUNG MEN'S ASSOCIATIONS IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD AND SEEKING TO UNITE THOSE WHO, REGARDING JESUS CHRIST AS THEIR GOD AND SAVIOUR, ACCORDING TO THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, DESIRE TO BE HIS DISCIPLES IN THEIR FAITH AND IN THEIR LIFE, AND TO ASSOCIATE THEIR EFFORTS FOR THE EXTENSION OF HIS KINGDOM. II) TO LEAD YOUNG PEOPLE TO THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO FULLNESS OF LIFE IN HIM. III) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. IV) TO RELIEVE OR ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF NEED OF PERSONS OF ALL AGES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS AND IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING, IMPROVING AND MANAGING HOUSES OR HOSTELS THAT PROVIDE RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION. V) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE NEED TO DEVELOP THE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPABILITIES OF PERSONS OF ALL AGES BY PROVIDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEAD OFFICE
YMCA West Kent
Tower House
Vale Rise
TONBRIDGE
TN9 1TB
- Phone:
- 01892542209
- Email:
- Heatherstevenson@ymcatg.org
- Website:
-
WestKentYMCA.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window