THE REBEL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of support for the training of young people in waterborne activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 05 June 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER STUART MOULTON FCA | Chair |
|
||||||
James Paul Donnelly | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
LAWRIE BRICE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2 | £77 | £77 | £1 | £31 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.00k | £845 | £1.35k | £0 | £8.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 23 October 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 14 December 2023 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 10 October 2022 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 11 October 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8TH SEPTEMBER 1989 AND 4TH APRIL 1990
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE BOAT AND SAIL TRAINING AND INSTRUCTION AND FACILITIES FOR WATER ACTIVITES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE INCLUDING MEMBERS OF THE SEA CADET CORPS SCOUT ASSOCIATION AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF DISABLEMENT POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES SUCH FACILITIES BEING PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE YOUNG PEOPLE FOR WHOM THEY ARE INTENDED. (B) TO ASSIST ANY OTHER CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND AGENCIES ESTABLEISHED FOR PURPOSES SIMILAR TO THOSE AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Roopers
Speldhurst
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN3 0QL
- Phone:
- 07771674979
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window