William Little Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Encouraging, identifying and supporting scientific research that will produce the greatest impact in the shortest time by establishing the causes of and preventing cerebral palsy. Bringing together the communities and organisations that will inform and influence the setting of global research priorities. Hosting and contributing to international workshops and conferences to share the insights.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 June 1990: Standard registration
- THE LITTLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD KHALID HAMEED DL, CBE | Chair | 12 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
Libby Aird-Brown | Trustee | 08 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kasper Reginald Tristram de Graaf | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr JACK SINGER | Trustee | 12 March 2009 |
|
|
||||
SARA JOCELYN COOKE MA Hons | Trustee | 12 March 2006 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL ANGUS CRAWFORD | Trustee | 12 March 1991 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.82k | £13.37k | £17.67k | £24.96k | £5.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.03k | £35.50k | £7.48k | £6.44k | £3.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH MAY 1990 as amended on 19 May 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS BY PROMOTING (I) THE STUDY OF DISEASES AND DISORDERS OF THE BRAIN, WHETHER HUMAN OR OTHERWISE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY DEVELOPMENTAL DISORDERS AND GENERALLY TO IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE MEANS OF DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CARE OF SUCH DISEASES AND DISORDERS AND (II) RESEARCH AND INVESTIGATION INTO THE CAUSES OF SUCH DISEASES AND DISORDERS AND THE POSSIBILITIES OF PREVENTION, ALLEVIATION OR CURE AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND INVESTIGATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PINERO HOUSE
115A HARLEY STREET
LONDON
W1G 6AR
- Phone:
- 07775868660
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window