HEMEL HOSPITAL RADIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide entertainment and information to the patients and staff of Hemel Hempstead General Hospital in order to help relieve sickness and infirmity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 12 July 1990: Standard registration
- 07 October 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 07 October 2014: Funds transferred to 258851 WATFORD HOSPITALS BROADCASTING SERVICE
- CITY AND HEMEL HOSPITAL RADIO (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.67k | £2.38k | £3.00k | £2.50k | £995 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.64k | £4.26k | £2.70k | £1.79k | £1.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 16 December 2013 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 07 January 2013 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 22 March 2012 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST MAY 1990 AMENDED 14TH JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS. INFIRMITY AND OLD AGE AMONGST PERSONS LIVING IN HEMEL HEMPSTEAD AND DISTRICT BY PROVIDING AN INTERNAL BROADCASTING SERVICE TO PATIENTS AT HEMEL HEMPSTEAD GENERAL HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window