THE MOORVIEW CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 803598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General Charitable Purposes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £92,771
Total expenditure: £101,023

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 July 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE COLVIN CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES MICHAEL BEALE CAYZER-COLVIN Trustee
THE CAYZER FAMILY ARCHIVE
Received: On time
The Caledonia Investments Charitable Foundation
Received: On time
THE WILTSHIRE HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
ESTHER ANNE MARY CAYZER-COLVIN Trustee
None on record
WILLIAM LAWRENCE GREENWELL SWAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £24.05k £53.06k £146.69k £111.41k £92.77k
Total expenditure £24.48k £57.08k £123.48k £122.11k £101.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 02 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 02 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 02 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 02 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CAYZER HOUSE
30 BUCKINGHAM GATE
LONDON
SW1E 6NN
Phone:
02078028080
Website:

No information available