THE CAIRN TERRIER RELIEF FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Fund is to relieve the suffering and distress of Cairn Terriers in need of care and attention
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 June 1990: Standard registration
- 10 December 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 10 December 2024: Funds transferred to 1203007 THE CAIRN TERRIER RELIEF FUND
- CAIRN RESCUE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.28k | £172.87k | £82.50k | £140.48k | £48.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.23k | £71.01k | £75.35k | £63.85k | £76.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 April 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND APRIL 1990 as amended on 27 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFFERING AND DISTRESS OF CAIRN TERRIERS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window