YOGI DIVINE SOCIETY (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITY. GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES, CHILDREN/YOUNG PEOPLE, MOTIVATING YOUTHS TO LEAD A PURE AND PIOUS LIFE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Leicester City
- Manchester City
- Surrey
- Telford & Wrekin
- Throughout London
- Australia
- France
- Germany
- India
- New Zealand
- United States
Governance
- 26 June 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yogi Divine Society UK Ltd | Trustee | 15 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mr Rekhav Patel | Trustee | 28 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR VINAY CHAUHAN | Trustee | 28 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAYESH PATEL | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JATIN SHAH | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
NAYAN TANK | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHIRAG MEHTA | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
RAJENDRA N PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SURESHBHAI C PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SATISH CHATWANI | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £660.22k | £579.95k | £1.12m | £398.57k | £451.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £196.01k | £332.79k | £237.17k | £167.88k | £388.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £649.75k | £570.49k | £1.11m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £8.11k | £9.45k | £8.54k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £2.35k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £195.28k | £332.79k | £121.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.70k | £4.25k | £2.01k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £6.79k | £0 | £114.59k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £725 | £0 | £116.17k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 95 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 June 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 June 2023 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 December 2022 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 12 December 2022 | 195 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/06/1990 AS AMENDED ON 15/06/2013 as amended on 05 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT AND TEACHING OF THE RELIGIOUS TENETS, DOCTRINES OBSERVANCES AND CULTURE ASSOCIATED WITH HINDUISM AND THE SWAMINARAYAN FAITH. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF HINDUISM (SWAMINARAYAN). 3. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) IN THE SUB-CONTINENT OF INDIA.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Haridham
Yogi Divine Society
Woodcock Hill
HARROW
Middlesex
HA3 0JH
- Phone:
- 07746387213
- Email:
- INFO@YDSUK.ORG
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window