Financial history THE ROYAL ARMOURIES DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity Number: 803617
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.93k £3.79k £5.19k £5.07k £2.47k
Total expenditure £2.85k £2.90k £3.09k £2.94k £2.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A