SWISS CULTURAL FUND UK LIMITED

Charity number: 803628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal activity of the charity continued to be that of furthering the charitable objective of the advancement of education and other exclusively charitable objectives related thereto.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £12,218
Total expenditure: £22,099

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 June 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • FESTIVAL OF SWITZERLAND IN BRITAIN CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
  • SWISS CULTURAL FUND IN BRITAIN (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Annakatharina Chiedza Spoerri Trustee 18 April 2025
None on record
Caroline Widmer Trustee 15 March 2024
None on record
Rene Renner Trustee 30 June 2023
None on record
Ruby Glaskin Trustee 17 October 2022
IN GOOD COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
Alexandra Mueller-Crepon Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Nicolas Feldmeyer Trustee 08 June 2022
None on record
Azmina Jasani Trustee 22 September 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.84k £11.09k £1.01k £1.96k £12.22k
Total expenditure £38.41k £26.67k £9.96k £28.31k £22.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 December 2022 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 December 2020 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
EMBASSY OF SWITZERLAND
16-18 MONTAGU PLACE
LONDON
W1H 2BQ
Phone:
02076166077