Accounts and annual returns THE MALCOLM EGLIN TRUST

Charity number: 803631
Charity reporting is up to date (82 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 January 2025 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 November 2024 372 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 February 2023 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 March 2022 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required