CHINA MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 12 July 1990: Standard registration
- 27 August 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2004 | 30/06/2005 | 30/06/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.39k | £33.38k | £12.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.17k | £55.07k | £22.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | 08 December 2009 | 222 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | 06 April 2009 | 341 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 05 July 2007 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | 30 October 2007 | 183 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | 09 June 2006 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | 09 June 2006 | 40 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH JUNE 1990
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN CHINA AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AMONGST CHINESE PEOPLE OR OTHERS BY WHATEVER LEGALLY CHARITABLE MEANS AND IN WHATSOEVER MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window