ST CUTHBERT'S CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ST. CUTHBERT'S CENTRE WAS SET UP IN 1990 TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS IN GREATER LONDON. ITS MISSION STATEMENT IS 'PROVING THE COMMUNITY CARES', WHICH IT DOES BY PROVIDING A SAFE HAVEN AND A VARIETY OF SERVICES AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE HOMELESS AND OTHERS WHO HAVE NOWHERE ELSE TO GO AND NO-ONE ELSE TO TURN TO FOR HELP. IT IS OPEN 5 DAYS A WEEK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
640 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 12 July 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Louise Coldrick | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Deborah Marie Ruddy | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Adrian Anderson | Trustee | 02 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Brown | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £552.09k | £609.51k | £438.57k | £587.89k | £498.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £383.55k | £424.02k | £451.31k | £532.78k | £597.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £77.11k | £83.00k | £76.72k | £73.29k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £493.05k | £543.25k | N/A | £485.60k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £59.04k | £4.21k | N/A | £94.43k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £418.86k | £540.92k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £132 | £493 | N/A | £7.86k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £61.56k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £74.20k | £2.33k | N/A | £94 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £373.71k | £402.52k | N/A | £507.18k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £9.85k | £21.51k | N/A | £25.61k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £2.16k | N/A | £16.15k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH JUNE 1990 as amended on 20 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS IN GREATER LONDON AREA.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Philbeach Gardens
Earls Court
LONDON
SW5 9EB
- Phone:
- 020 7835 1389
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window