RUCKLERS LANE (KINGS LANGLEY) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities for recreation/social activities within the local area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 16 July 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy James Bond | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Clements | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Robert Mclean | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy McLean | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.89k | £11.61k | £12.94k | £8.76k | £11.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.36k | £7.21k | £9.62k | £4.53k | £14.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.81k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH JUNE 1990 as amended on 19 Jun 2023 as amended on 20 May 2024
Charitable objects
(a) to promote the benefit and protect the interests of the inhabitants of Kings Langley and in particular Rucklers Lane and the neighbourhood together defined as in sub-paragraph (c) below (“the area of benefit") without distinction of gender, sexual orientation, race, or of political, religious or other opinions by associating together the said inhabitants and the local authorities and voluntary organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants. (b) to establish or to secure the establishment of a Community Centre (hereinafter called “the Village Hall") and to maintain and manage the same (whether alone or in co-operation with any local statutory authority or other person or body) for activities promoted by the Association and its constituent bodies in furtherance of the above objects. (c) The area of benefit shall be residences in Rucklers Lane and its immediate neighbourhood (being roads leading off Rucklers Lane up to but not including Barnes Lane) and as defined in Trust Deed 6th March 1967. (d) The Association shall be non-party in politics and non-sectarian in religion.
Area of benefit
KINGS LANGLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Village Hall
50 Rucklers Lane
Kings Langley
Herts
United Kingdom
WD4 8AU
- Phone:
- 07391 850021
- Email:
- rucklerslanehall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window