ACORN CHILDREN'S CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer breakfast club, after school club, extra pick ups and holiday schemes for children between the ages of 4 and 11 years old. Children come from four local schools Stillness Infant, Stillness Junior, Dalmain and William of York. We currently have capacity for 50 places per day.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lewisham
Governance
- 11 July 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Johnson | Chair | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Edward Phillips | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma O'Brien | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|||||
SIA JOHNNY | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ACHEAMPONG | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
YUMI TODA-MITCHISON | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
JEAN DIALA ANN LEADER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.37k | £71.04k | £102.07k | £132.74k | £137.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.47k | £75.59k | £104.72k | £117.34k | £127.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 May 2022 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 May 2022 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 July 2021 | 161 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 July 2021 | 161 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH JANUARY 1982
Charitable objects
A. TO PROMOTE THE CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BETWEEN THE AGES OF 5 AND 11 OR ATTENDING SCHOOL WITHIN THE AREA COVERED BY ACKROYD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (THEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WHICH CHILDREN ARE IN NEED OF CARE DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS AND TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH CHILDREN IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. B. ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS PROVIDING SUCH CARE AND EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
AS DEFINED IN CONSTITION
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ackroyd Community Centre
Ackroyd Road
SE23 1DL
- Phone:
- 02082913181
- Email:
- acornasc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window