THE MONDAY CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a meeting place in Abbots Langley Herts where people with severe learning difficulties can meet up on a Monday evening. The club takes its members out bowling at least 6 times a year and to see a musical show in London once a year, the club meets at Abbots Langley Community Centre where we have many activities going on each week, Table tennis, Snooker, arts& Crafts, Coffee Bar ETC:
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 18 July 1990: Standard registration
- 27 March 2023: Funds received from 268533 THE ABBOTS LANGLEY GOOD NEIGHBOURS ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Hyde | Trustee | 26 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Holt | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY ALICE BYRNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.30k | £2.46k | £4.14k | £5.30k | £14.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20k | £1.36k | £5.84k | £7.48k | £5.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £250 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH JUNE 1990
Charitable objects
TO PROVID E OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE MENTALLY AND PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED LIVING IN ABBOTS LANGLEY, KINGS LANGLEY, GARSTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
ABBOTS LANGLEY - KINGS LANGLEY GARSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Greenways
Abbots Langley
WD5 0EU
- Phone:
- 07752315202
- Email:
- themondaycluba.l@gmail.com
- Website:
-
themondaycluba.lgmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window