THE BARCLAY FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of grants towards organisations with a focus on, but not limited to, medical research, aid for the young, and aid for the sick, disabled and disadvantaged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 July 1990: Standard registration
- 23 April 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE DAVID AND FREDERICK BARCLAY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £790.50k | £638.69k | £709.62k | £149.12k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £736.04k | £679.45k | £724.61k | £155.06k | £50 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £790.00k | £638.50k | £709.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £496 | £188 | £117 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £736.04k | £679.45k | £724.61k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.97k | £4.97k | £4.97k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £654.79k | £575.25k | £681.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 May 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 30 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 30 July 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 10 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 10 May 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH OCTOBER 1989 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 24 SEPTEMBER 1991 AND TRUSTEES RESOLUTION DATED 1 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OR FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN SUCH MANNER AND (IF MORE THAN ONE) IN SUCH SHARES OR PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window