Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF PURLEY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 803700
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £20.46k £15.41k £60.53k £10.13k £6.07k
Total expenditure £15.63k £26.78k £41.62k £30.01k £29.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A