NATIONAL ALLIANCE OF WOMEN'S ORGANISATIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lobbying and campaigning, building bridges and alliances between organisations, providing opportunities to network, developing the capacity of women's organisations, engaging young women with democratic institutions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 July 1990: Standard registration
- NAWO (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Monica Eghrari Ghaem-Maghami | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Kaylee Jackson | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jo Anna Thompson | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Sally Spear | Trustee | 26 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dr Wendy Cunningham Momen | Trustee | 24 April 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Fatoumata Diallo | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Justina Mutale | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Margaret Mary Clark | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.23k | £7.80k | £9.23k | £4.25k | £5.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.56k | £7.72k | £5.88k | £7.15k | £7.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/02/1990 AS AMENDED ON 23/05/1991 AS AMENDED ON 26/11/2003 AS AMENDED ON 28/02/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EDUCATION ON THE POSITION OF WOMEN AND ON THE INEQUALITIES WHICH HAVE BEEN AND ARE IMPOSED ON THEM BY LAW OR CUSTOM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wixamtree, 28 Sand Lane
Northill
Biggleswade
Beds.
SG18 9AD
- Phone:
- 01767 627626
- Email:
- admin@nawo.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window