MORDEN LITTLE LEAGUE FOOTBALL

Charity Number: 803722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Free football for 900 children aged between 7 and 14.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £47,993
Total expenditure: £41,104

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Merton
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 July 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel Grey Trustee 07 June 2016
None on record
Andy Butcher Trustee 11 June 2012
None on record
MR DAVE BONNER Trustee
None on record
JEANNETTE LUFFMAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £44.41k £35.19k £24.67k £56.20k £47.99k
Total expenditure £41.31k £32.71k £15.37k £35.99k £41.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 20 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 10 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 10 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 19 September 2020 203 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 19 September 2020 203 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 Allgood Close
MORDEN
Surrey
SM4 4PA
Phone:
07590516475