SANDRINGHAM SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DISCO, CHRISTMAS FAIR, QUIZ NIGHT, END OF YEAR BBQ, SUMMER FESTIVAL, CURRY NIGHTS, PTC DONATIONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 19 July 1990: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 01 March 2012: Re-registered
- FRIENDS OF SANDRINGHAM SCHOOL (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tara Macdonald | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Fingland | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN CASWELL | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.59k | £2.37k | £11.29k | £13.86k | £15.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.35k | £5.10k | £4.37k | £9.70k | £8.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | Download Open in new window | |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH JUNE 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF SANDRINGHAM SCOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Ridgeway
St. Albans
AL4 9NX
- Phone:
- 01727 799560
- Email:
- sandringham.foss@gmail.com
- Website:
-
sandringham.herts.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window