BRITISH INFERTILITY COUNSELLING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity to support Fertility counsellors and promote Fertility counselling
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 July 1990: Standard registration
- B I C A (Working name)
- BICA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Pericleous-Smith | Chair | 20 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Caroline Spencer | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Parkin | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Howe | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.87k | £42.80k | £53.06k | £55.09k | £63.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.49k | £12.64k | £19.52k | £29.53k | £60.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAY 1990 AS AMENDED 10 MARCH 1990, 11 MAY 1991, 10 JUNE 1992 AND 20 MAY 1998. as amended on 27 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRACTICE AND STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO INFERTILITY COUNSELLING AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROOKDALE
Malton Road
YORK
YO31 9LT
- Phone:
- 07771885443
- Email:
- chair@bica.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window