Financial history THE RAV CHESED TRUST

Charity number: 803758
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £15 £0 £0 £150.00k £225.00k
Total expenditure £28.84k £43.28k £16.69k £35.37k £22.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A