BRITISH SCOLIOSIS RESEARCH FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The British Scoliosis Research Foundation promotes research into the treatment of spinal deformities. BSRF merged with Scoliosis Association UK (SAUK) on Jan 1st 2023 and continues to fund high quality research into scoliosis and holds an international symposium to spread the knowledge gained from research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income includes £30,854 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 July 1990: Standard registration
- 16 August 2023: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 16 August 2023: Funds transferred to 1181463 Scoliosis Support and Research
- BSRF (Working name)
- THE BRITISH SCOLIOSIS RESEARCH FOUNDATION INCORPORATING THE PHILLIP ZORAB SCOLIOSIS RESEARCH FUND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.53k | £152.56k | £57.78k | £130.99k | £316.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.28k | £175.11k | £68.69k | £82.79k | £98.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH JULY 1990 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON 29TH JANUARY 1998.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO SCOLIOSIS AND OTHER SPINAL DEFORMITIES AND MORE PARTICULARY INTO THEIR CAUSES AND INTO THE CHEST AND HEART CONSEQUENCES THEREOF AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window