Accounts and annual returns OLD TRIDENTS SOCIETY IN CONNECTION WITH TRENT COLLEGE

Charity number: 810009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 30 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 September 2024 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 September 2024 447 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 19 September 2024 447 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window