OLD TRIDENTS SOCIETY IN CONNECTION WITH TRENT COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further the interests of Trent College, Derbyshire by providing financial support to Trent College, arranging various activities for the members of the Society in order to further continuing interest in and support of Trent College and providing means of communication between Trent College and its former students.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 12 September 1963: Standard registration
- THE OLD TRIDENTS SOCIETY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOMINIC ALEXANDER KALANTARY | Chair | 03 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Singleton | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Hall | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Captain Ian Norman | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Wright | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
George Livesey | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Joseph Nathanail | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
REX GOODING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.47k | £16.07k | £25.96k | £19.43k | £22.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.32k | £13.96k | £21.38k | £16.83k | £19.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 September 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 September 2024 | 447 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 September 2024 | 447 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 21ST JANUARY 1903 AS AMENDED 20TH JULY 1968 AND 8TH JANUARY 1971 AND BY ORDER OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 12 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE INTERESTS OF TRENT COLLEGE LONG EATON, DERBYSHIRE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o ALUMNI OFFICE
TRENT COLLEGE
DERBY ROAD
LONG EATON
NOTTINGHAM
NG10 4AD
- Phone:
- 0115 983 6927
- Email:
- otsociety@trentcollege.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window