QUORN TOWN LANDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 810011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

ADVANCEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT OF THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT OR WHO HAVE A PARENT OR PARENTS RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF QUORNDON AND WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSITANCE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 November 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • TOWN LAND'S EDUCATOINAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Walling Chair 01 August 2018
RAWLINS COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
QUORN TOWN LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
QUORNDON AID IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THOMAS RAWLINS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Chri Ronald Trustee 07 August 2024
None on record
ANDREW BROWN Trustee 16 May 2023
QUORN TOWN LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
QUORNDON AID IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Joanna Clarke Trustee 03 August 2022
QUORNDON AID IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
QUORN TOWN LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
Janice Mary Slater Trustee 12 November 2019
QUORN TOWN LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
QUORNDON AID IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Bob Andrews Trustee 12 February 2019
QUORN TOWN LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
QUORNDON AID IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Edward Wilmer Maltby Trustee 20 November 2018
QUORN TOWN LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
QUORNDON AID IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
HILARY JEAN FRYER Trustee 13 June 2018
QUORN TOWN LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
QUORNDON AID IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
RURAL COMMUNITY COUNCIL (LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND)
Received: On time
PAUL CHARLES MATTHEWS Trustee
QUORNDON AID IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
QUORN TOWN LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £308 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Windsor Close
Quorn
LOUGHBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE12 8DF
Phone:
07876310728
Website:

No information available