THE FLEET PARISH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide small grants for education & needy within the Community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 13 November 1963: Standard registration
- THE FLEET PARISH COTTAGE HOMES (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR ROSS ANDREW DEAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rachael Cotton | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40 | £86 | £105 | £28 | £4 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £300 | £200 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 130 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 130 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 497 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 497 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 18TH NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IS TO BE DIVIDED INTO EQUAL SHARES FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER RESIDENT IN THE AOB WHO WERE EITHER BORN IN THE AOB OR HAVE RESIDED THERE FOR 5 AND WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE SUCH PERSONS BY; (A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR (B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OF BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OF FACILITIES TO THOSE ELIGIBLE FOR ASSISTANCE. (2) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AOB, AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FLEET, LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAIR VIEW
PRIESTFIELD DROVE
GEDNEY
SPALDING
PE12 0BP
- Phone:
- 01406363176
- Email:
- rossdean@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window