Financial history THE CROYDON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 810114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £218.80k £200.00k £200.00k £308.04k £257.95k
Total expenditure £342.60k £283.59k £213.60k £293.91k £270.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A