Trustees HUNTLEY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 810168

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Mark Evans | Chair | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Lowe | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Keith Richards | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Irene Walker | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
John David Baker | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Paul Rebbeck | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
SANDIE MIDDLETON | Trustee | 05 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA JOAN PENGELLY | Trustee | 27 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER SMITH | Trustee | 28 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT CHARLES WATKINS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.