FARNBOROUGH (HANTS) COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 810246
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of meeting areas for the community of Farnborough, Aldershot and surrounding areas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017

Total income: £55,208
Total expenditure: £52,624

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 April 1971: Standard registration
  • 05 November 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 05 November 2019: Funds transferred to 1059794 RUSHMOOR VOLUNTARY SERVICES
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £62.28k £58.91k £58.91k £63.25k £55.21k
Total expenditure £63.16k £66.17k £66.17k £71.13k £52.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £6.00k £24.00k £600

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 September 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 May 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 10 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 23 September 2016 On Time