BOATMEN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 810279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Charity to benefit the Boatment of Deal and Lifeboat Men of Walmer and to promote charitable purposes for the benefit of the inhabitants of Deal, Monegham and Sholden as Trustees think fit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,894
Total expenditure: £1,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 February 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DEAL BOATMEN'S ROOMS (Working name)
  • BOATMEN'S READING ROOM AND TRUST PROPERTY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janet Thorpe-Jones Trustee 05 May 2024
ELIZABETH NOAKES
Received: On time
ST. LEONARD'S SOCIAL CENTRE CHARITY
Received: On time
Wendy Susan Manion Trustee 07 May 2023
ST. LEONARD'S SOCIAL CENTRE CHARITY
Received: On time
STEPHEN CHARLES MANION Trustee 07 May 2023
ELIZABETH NOAKES
Received: On time
THE HUGH AND MONTAGUE LENEY TRAVELLING AWARDS TRUST
Received: 48 days late
The Parochial Church Council of The Ecclesiastical Parish of Upper Deal & Gt Mongeham
Received: On time
Rev Monica Eunice Cameron Trustee 15 August 2021
ELIZABETH NOAKES
Received: On time
MRS MARY OLIVIA SAFFERY TURNER FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Received: On time
ST. LEONARD'S SOCIAL CENTRE CHARITY
Received: On time
The Parochial Church Council of The Ecclesiastical Parish of Upper Deal & Gt Mongeham
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.68k £6.63k £5.67k £5.67k £4.89k
Total expenditure £7.32k £1.00k £1.84k £1.84k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 January 2025 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 April 2024 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 November 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
292 ST. RICHARDS ROAD
DEAL
CT14 9LG
Phone:
01304367082
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available