Accounts and annual returns 1ST MONKMOOR SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 810284
Charity reporting is up to date (83 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 April 2025 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 April 2025 449 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 April 2025 814 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 April 2025 814 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 April 2025 1179 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 01 April 2021 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required