Financial history 1ST MONKMOOR SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 810284
Charity reporting is up to date (83 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.61k £30.09k £28.65k £16.55k £11.60k
Total expenditure £10.27k £16.85k £14.68k £18.37k £15.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.30k £11.57k N/A N/A