Register of Charities - The Charity Commission MARTHA BOWEN
Charity Number: 213881-2
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 19 OCTOBER 1911 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 7 APRIL 1967 AS AMENDED ON 18 AUGUST 1993 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 43 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1992
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FOR EITHER OR BOTH OF:- 1. TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A FUND FOR THE PROVISION OF NEW ALMSHOUSES. 2. FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF POOR WOMEN RESIDENT IN THE BOROUGH OF HAVERFORDWEST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
HAVERFORDWEST
Registration history
- 01 November 1967: Standard registration
- 11 June 1996: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.