Accounts and annual returns TORPOINT AND RAME COMMUNITY NURSES FRIENDS

Charity number: 900007
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 February 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 27 February 2022 14 February 2023 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2021 05 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2020 18 January 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2020 Not Required