Financial history TORPOINT AND RAME COMMUNITY NURSES FRIENDS

Charity number: 900007
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/02/2018 27/02/2019 27/02/2020 27/02/2021 27/02/2022
Total gross income £2.13k £8.68k £1.52k £158 £83
Total expenditure £884 £4.52k £5.43k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A