Accounts and annual returns HUGH SEXEY MIDDLE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 900008
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 April 2022 281 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 November 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required