THREE SPIRES SINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Choral Society
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 29 June 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORA WICKS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sally Hind | Trustee | 08 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sally Williams | Trustee | 08 September 2014 |
|
|||||
CAMILLA MARGARET COMEAU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.44k | £19.64k | £60.47k | £75.03k | £75.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.24k | £8.16k | £80.98k | £75.99k | £75.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH MAY 1989
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS CONSISTENT WITH STATUS AS AN EDUCATIONAL CHARITY AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAK FARM
CARNON CREASE
CARNON DOWNS
TRURO
TR3 6LJ
- Phone:
- 07395134284
- Email:
- oak.farm@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window