WEARE GIFFARD RECREATION GROUND ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
children's play area. Senior cricket, Junior Cricket, net practice and junior cricket practice Annual Fete. Occasional youth club activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 17 August 1989: Standard registration
- WEARE GIFFARD PARK (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Austen Michael Donnellan | Chair | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Jill Lees | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARLENE HOILE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/04/2020 | 18/04/2021 | 18/04/2022 | 18/04/2023 | 18/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.26k | £4.41k | £4.28k | £2.76k | £3.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.78k | £7.28k | £3.52k | £4.07k | £2.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 April 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 April 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 April 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 April 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 APRIL 1989 AND DEED FOR TRUST DATED 17 APRIL 1989
Charitable objects
A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WEARE GIFFARD IN SUCH MANNER AS THE COMMITTEE OF MANAGEMENT FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL THINK FIT (AND AS FURTHER DETAILED IN THE TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
WEARE GIFFARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRYANTS COTTAGE
WEARE GIFFARD
BIDEFORD
DEVON
EX39 4QU
- Phone:
- 01805624140
- Email:
- marlenehoile@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window