MITTON MANOR PRE-SCHOOL & AFTER SCHOOL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a community run playgroup for 2.5 to 5 year olds. We provide caring, stimulating environment in which the children learn through play. We aim to provide a safe facility in which children can gain confidence and social skills, creating a solid foundation for entry into primary school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £117,583 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 21 August 1989: Standard registration
- MITTON MANOR PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Munro | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Harris | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Lewis | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Redfern | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jones | Trustee | 02 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.74k | £171.36k | £184.89k | £173.64k | £177.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.66k | £162.64k | £189.63k | £184.69k | £181.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £116.88k | £98.87k | N/A | N/A | £117.58k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 07 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 07 October 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/01/1985 AS AMENDED ON 01/12/1995 AS AMENDED ON 06/12/2000 AS AMENDED ON 03/10/2007 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/2011 AS AMENDED ON 05 DEC 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE GROUP IS TO EMBODY THE VISION OF PATA THROUGH THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE DEVELOPMENT, CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE AND ALSO OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY (VOLUNTARY MANAGED) GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE MITTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
CARRANT ROAD
MITTON
TEWKESBURY
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL20 8AR
- Phone:
- 01684275426
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window