BANBURY MUSLIM MOSQUE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing religious activities and offering prayer facilities to the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 09 August 1989: Standard registration
- BANBURY MASJID BANBURY MOSQUE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BASHARAT HASSAN HANIF | Chair | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Irfan TAi | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mubarak Hussain | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
nazam hussain | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR JAVED IQBAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BASHARAT HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDUL MAJID | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARFRAZ BHATTI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.39k | £203.00k | £142.32k | £283.06k | £357.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.19k | £296.83k | £70.42k | £139.72k | £439.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £23.18k | £47.34k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 August 2022 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 23 August 2022 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 18 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2019
(These accounts |
18 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH MAY 1989
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM ACCORDING TO THE QURAN AND SUNAH AND THE DOCTRINES AHLE-SUNNATUL JAMAT AND BRELUI. (11) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THOSE DOCTRINES. (111) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ISLAMIC HISTORY, LANGUAGES, LITERATURE, POETRY, MUSIC AND RELIGIOUS TRADITIONS AND CUSTOMS. (1V) TO RELIEVE MUSLIMS IN BANBURY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY VIRTUE OF POVERTY, OLD AGE OR SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
BANBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Banbury Madni Masjid
Merton Street
Banbury Oxon
OX16 4RX
- Phone:
- 01295276662
- Email:
- Banburymadnimasjid@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window