MIDDLE WALLOP AIR SHOW CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This Charity is in suspended animation and will not be re-activated. Action will be taken in Calendar year 2009 to close it down and to transfer its remaining funds to a similar Charity operating in support of the Army Air Corps.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 07 July 1989: Standard registration
- 03 March 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 28 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 19 November 2008 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 08 January 2008 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST AUGUST 1988
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE HAMPSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window