LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF DARTMOUTH AND DISTRICT HEALTHCARE

Charity number: 900080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise money to purchase equipment for the Hospital

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £500
Total expenditure: £38,752

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 October 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF DARTMOUTH HOSPITAL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carol Lingard Chair
THE PARISH OF DARTMOUTH CHARITIES
Received: On time
LIANE EAGLESFIELD BALDOCK Trustee 31 October 2016
None on record
GILLIAN CAROLE SECRETAN Trustee 08 June 2016
None on record
Valerie Vince Trustee 21 May 2014
None on record
SHEILA BOSWELL Trustee 24 August 2011
None on record
CHRISTINE BERYL ROBERTS Trustee
None on record
SUSAN JUNE POUND Trustee
None on record
JEANETTE ELSIE ATKINS Trustee
None on record
DOCTOR PADDY DEBORAH MCCONAGHEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.61k £460 £31.06k £560 £500
Total expenditure £2.77k £3.99k £2.82k £19.68k £38.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ARCHWAY COTTAGE
OLD MILL LANE
DARTMOUTH
TQ6 9JQ
Phone:
01803832105
Email:
dmhl@msn.com
Website:

No information available