Trustees THE CHURCH OF THE HOLY SPIRIT/RESEARCH AND ENLIGHTENMENT CENTRE TRUST
Charity number: 900101

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Roseby | Chair | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Rooney | Trustee | 09 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARY COLLINS | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Collins | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Ellen Kitney | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Roseby | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gwen Cock | Trustee | 28 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEAN WHEATLEY | Trustee | 12 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.