CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH CLEEVE HILL COMMON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conservation management of unimproved limestone grassland, woodland, scrub and geological and archaeological features of Cleeve common. Provision of education on the natural habitat. Facilitation and management of outdoor recreation on Cleeve Common.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £82,549 from 3 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 14 September 1989: Standard registration
- CLEEVE COMMON BOARD OF CONSERVATORS (Working name)
- CLEEVE COMMON TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cathal Lynch | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Sankey | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Arthur Howell | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Scott | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Torrington | Trustee | 25 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Harris | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Stayt | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ann West | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA HUGHES | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR ALAN ROBINSON | Trustee | 22 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIMON WHEELER | Trustee | 13 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
COL PHILIP ALAN ROBSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.24k | £156.89k | £134.96k | £173.43k | £138.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.72k | £155.11k | £146.09k | £178.87k | £152.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £89.42k | £89.02k | £92.44k | £128.84k | £82.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
COMMONS REGULATION (CLEEVE) PROVISIONAL CONFIRMATION ORDER ACT 1890
Charitable objects
RIGHTS OF ACCESS TO AND RECREATION ON THE COMMON RESERVED TO THE INHABITANTS OF BISHOPS CLEEVE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
BISHOPS CLEEVE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parish Office
Church Road
Bishops Cleeve
CHELTENHAM
GL52 8LR
- Phone:
- 07471687877
- Email:
- info@cleevecommon.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window