CARING AT CHRISTMAS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with people who are homeless or at risk of becoming homeless in and around the city of Bristol throughout the year. We run the homeless shelter over the Christmas period, providing accommodation, food and support for hundreds of guests; we run Bristol Nightstop providing young people with accommodation and support throughout the year; we produce the Survival Handbook twice a year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 October 1989: Standard registration
- 17 February 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 17 February 2015: Funds transferred to 1151645 CARING IN BRISTOL
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.35k | £102.25k | £101.30k | £152.33k | £153.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.18k | £160.59k | £121.59k | £342.26k | £435.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 16 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | 16 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | 27 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | 27 May 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 14 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | 15 May 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 31 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | 27 April 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15/09/1989 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS AMONG PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND WITH A PREFERENCE FOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN OR NEAR THE CITY OF BRISTOL MARRIED OR UNMARRIED AND NOT LIVING IN A FAMILY WITHOUT DISTINCTION AS TO AGE OR SEX BEING PERSONS OF A ROOTLESS WAY OF LIFE WHO ARE SUFFERING SOCIAL OR EMOTIONAL DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window